Senate | 05/31/2024 | Certified copies of resolution sent, 05-31-24 | ||
Senate | 04/04/2024 | Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1). | ||
Senate | 04/03/2024 | One Day Notice 04-04-24. | ||
Senate | 04/03/2024 | Reported from HRE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3437) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1). | ||
Senate | 03/28/2024 | The committee(s) on HRE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HRE were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kim, Kidani, Hashimoto, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fukunaga. | ||
Senate | 03/25/2024 | The committee(s) on HRE has scheduled a public hearing on 03-28-24 3:00PM; CR 229 & Videoconference (Proposed Draft). | ||
Senate | 03/20/2024 | Re-Referred to HRE. | ||
Senate | 03/14/2024 | Referred to HOU, WAM. | ||
Senate | 03/08/2024 | Offered. |