Senate | 05/31/2024 | Certified copies of resolution sent, 05-31-24 | ||
Senate | 04/04/2024 | Report and Resolution Adopted. | ||
Senate | 04/03/2024 | One Day Notice 04-04-24. | ||
Senate | 04/03/2024 | Reported from EDU/HRE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3450) with recommendation of adoption. | ||
Senate | 03/27/2024 | The committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in EDU were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kidani, Kim, Hashimoto, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Richards. | ||
Senate | 03/27/2024 | The committee(s) on HRE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HRE were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kim, Kidani, Fukunaga, Hashimoto, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. | ||
Senate | 03/22/2024 | The committee(s) on EDU/HRE has scheduled a public hearing on 03-27-24 3:00PM; CR 229 & Videoconference. | ||
Senate | 03/14/2024 | Referred to EDU/HRE. | ||
Senate | 03/08/2024 | Offered. |