Senate | 05/31/2024 | Certified copies of resolution sent, 05-31-24 | ||
Senate | 04/04/2024 | Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1). | ||
Senate | 04/03/2024 | One Day Notice 04-04-24. | ||
Senate | 04/03/2024 | Reported from CPN/HHS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3624) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1). | ||
Senate | 03/22/2024 | The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keohokalole, Fukunaga, Richards; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) McKelvey, Awa. | ||
Senate | 03/22/2024 | The committee(s) on HHS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HHS were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) San Buenaventura, Keohokalole, Shimabukuro; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Aquino, Awa. | ||
Senate | 03/18/2024 | The committee(s) on CPN/HHS has scheduled a public hearing on 03-22-24 9:38AM; CR 229 & Videoconference. | ||
Senate | 03/14/2024 | Referred to CPN/HHS. | ||
Senate | 03/08/2024 | Offered. |