Senate | 05/31/2024 | Certified copies of resolution sent, 05-31-24 | ||
Senate | 04/04/2024 | Report and Resolution Adopted. | ||
Senate | 04/03/2024 | One Day Notice 04-04-24. | ||
Senate | 04/03/2024 | Reported from HOU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3523) with recommendation of adoption. | ||
Senate | 03/28/2024 | The committee(s) on HOU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HOU were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Chang, Hashimoto, Kanuha; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Aquino, Awa. | ||
Senate | 03/20/2024 | Re-Referred to HOU. | ||
Senate | 03/19/2024 | The committee(s) on HOU deferred the measure until 03-28-24 1:00PM; CR 225. | ||
Senate | 03/15/2024 | The committee(s) on HOU has scheduled a public hearing on 03-19-24 1:20PM; Conference Room 225 & Videoconference. | ||
Senate | 03/14/2024 | Referred to HOU, WAM. | ||
Senate | 03/08/2024 | Offered. |