Senate | 05/31/2024 | Certified copies of resolution sent, 05-31-24 | ||
Senate | 04/04/2024 | Report and Resolution Adopted as amended (SD1). Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Awa). | ||
Senate | 04/03/2024 | One Day Notice 04-04-24. | ||
Senate | 04/03/2024 | Reported from TCA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3495) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1). | ||
Senate | 03/28/2024 | The committee(s) on TCA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TCA were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Lee, Elefante, Kanuha; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Inouye, Awa. | ||
Senate | 03/22/2024 | The committee(s) on TCA has scheduled a public hearing on 03-28-24 3:02PM; Conference Room 224 & Videoconference. | ||
Senate | 02/12/2024 | Referred to TCA. | ||
Senate | 01/17/2024 | Offered. |