Senate | 05/31/2024 | Certified copies of resolution sent, 05-31-24 | ||
Senate | 04/01/2024 | Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1). | ||
Senate | 03/28/2024 | One Day Notice 04-01-24. | ||
Senate | 03/28/2024 | Reported from HOU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3389) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1). | ||
Senate | 03/19/2024 | The committee(s) on HOU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HOU were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Chang, Hashimoto, Aquino, Kanuha, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. | ||
Senate | 03/15/2024 | Re-Referred to HOU. | ||
Senate | 03/15/2024 | The committee(s) on HOU has scheduled a public hearing on 03-19-24 1:10PM; Conference Room 225 & Videoconference. | ||
Senate | 03/14/2024 | Referred to HOU, JDC. | ||
Senate | 03/08/2024 | Offered. |