Senate | 05/31/2024 | Certified copies of resolution sent, 05-31-24 | ||
Senate | 04/02/2024 | Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1). | ||
Senate | 04/01/2024 | One Day Notice 04-02-24. | ||
Senate | 04/01/2024 | Reported from HHS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3398) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1). | ||
Senate | 03/22/2024 | The committee(s) on HHS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HHS were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) San Buenaventura, Aquino, Keohokalole; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Shimabukuro, Awa. | ||
Senate | 03/19/2024 | The committee(s) on HHS has scheduled a public hearing on 03-22-24 1:00PM; CR 225 & Videoconference. | ||
Senate | 03/14/2024 | Referred to HHS. | ||
Senate | 03/08/2024 | Offered. |