Senate | 05/31/2024 | Certified copies of resolution sent, 05-31-24 | ||
Senate | 04/04/2024 | Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1). | ||
Senate | 04/03/2024 | One Day Notice 04-04-24. | ||
Senate | 04/03/2024 | Reported from GVO/PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3630) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1). | ||
Senate | 04/02/2024 | The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in PSM were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Elefante, Rhoads; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Fukunaga, Awa. | ||
Senate | 04/02/2024 | The committee(s) on GVO recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in GVO were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) McKelvey, San Buenaventura, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard, Awa. | ||
Senate | 03/27/2024 | The committee(s) on GVO/PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 04-02-24 3:00PM; Conference Room 225 & Videoconference. | ||
Senate | 03/14/2024 | Referred to GVO/PSM. | ||
Senate | 03/08/2024 | Offered. |