Senate | 05/31/2024 | Certified copies of resolution sent, 05-31-24 | ||
Senate | 04/04/2024 | Report and Resolution Adopted. | ||
Senate | 04/03/2024 | One Day Notice 04-04-24. | ||
Senate | 04/03/2024 | Reported from TCA/PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3536) with recommendation of adoption. | ||
Senate | 03/27/2024 | The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in PSM were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Elefante, Rhoads; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Fukunaga, Awa. | ||
Senate | 03/27/2024 | The committee(s) on TCA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in TCA were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Lee, Elefante, Kanuha; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Inouye, Awa. | ||
Senate | 03/22/2024 | The committee(s) on TCA/PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 03-27-24 3:00PM; Conference Room 225 & Videoconference. | ||
Senate | 03/14/2024 | Referred to TCA/PSM. | ||
Senate | 03/08/2024 | Offered. |