House
|
04/30/2025
|
Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Pierick voting no (1) and Representative(s) Cochran excused (1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2025
|
Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2025
|
48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 04-30-25
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2025
|
Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 141).
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2025
|
Forty-eight (48) hours notice Wednesday, 04-30-25.
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2025
|
Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 141) as amended in (CD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2025
|
The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 2 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kim, Hashimoto; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella.
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2025
|
The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 3 Ayes: Representative(s) Garrett, Keohokapu-Lee Loy, Alcos; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2025
|
Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-24-25 1:30PM; Conference Room 229.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2025
|
Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-22-25 1:30PM; Conference Room 229.
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2025
|
Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 828).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2025
|
Senate Conferees Appointed: Kim Chair; Hashimoto Co-Chair; Fevella.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2025
|
Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 732).
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2025
|
House Conferees Appointed: Garrett, Keohokapu-Lee Loy Co-Chairs; Alcos.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2025
|
Filed.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2025
|
Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 559).
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2025
|
House disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2025
|
Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 561) in amended form (SD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2025
|
Report Adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2025
|
One Day Notice 04-03-25.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2025
|
Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1524) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2025
|
The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 12 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Moriwaki, Aquino, DeCoite, Elefante, Hashimoto, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Kim, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Lee, C..
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2025
|
The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-28-25 10:02AM; Conference Room 211 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2025
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2025
|
Reported from HRE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1247) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2025
|
The committee(s) on HRE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HRE were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kim, Kidani, Hashimoto, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fukunaga.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2025
|
The committee(s) on HRE has scheduled a public hearing on 03-18-25 3:00PM; Conference Room 229 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2025
|
Referred to HRE, WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2025
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2025
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 162).
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2025
|
Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Garcia voting no (1) and Representative(s) Cochran, Pierick, Templo, Ward excused (4). Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2025
|
Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 957), recommending passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2025
|
The committee on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamashita, Takenouchi, Grandinetti, Hussey, Keohokapu-Lee Loy, Kitagawa, Kusch, Lamosao, Miyake, Morikawa, Templo, Reyes Oda; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Holt, Lee, M., Alcos, Ward.
|
|
|
House
|
02/19/2025
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Friday, 02-21-25 2:00PM in House conference room 308 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
02/13/2025
|
Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Garcia, Pierick voting no (2) and Representative(s) Cochran, Kitagawa, Ward excused (3).
|
|
|
House
|
02/13/2025
|
Reported from HED (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 611), recommending referral to FIN.
|
|
|
House
|
02/12/2025
|
The committee on HED recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Garrett, Amato, Evslin, Kapela, Kila, La Chica, Olds, Woodson, Muraoka, Souza; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Sayama.
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2025
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by HED on Wednesday, 02-12-25 2:00PM in House conference room 309 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2025
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on HED with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Pierick voting no (1) and Representative(s) Ward excused (1).
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2025
|
Reported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 186) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to HED.
|
|
|
House
|
02/05/2025
|
The committee on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Takayama, Keohokapu-Lee Loy, Amato, Chun, Marten, Olds, Takenouchi, Alcos, Garcia; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
01/31/2025
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Wednesday, 02-05-25 9:30AM in House conference room 329 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
01/27/2025
|
Referred to HLT, HED, FIN, referral sheet 4
|
|
|
House
|
01/23/2025
|
Introduced and Pass First Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
01/22/2025
|
Pending introduction.
|
|
|