House
|
02/12/2025
|
The committee(s) on HSG recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2025
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by HSG on Wednesday, 02-12-25 9:00AM in House conference room 430 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
02/03/2025
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on HSG with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Pierick voting no (1) and Representative(s) Cochran, Ward excused (2).
|
|
|
House
|
02/03/2025
|
Reported from EDN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 47) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to HSG.
|
|
|
House
|
01/28/2025
|
The committee on EDN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Woodson, La Chica, Amato, Evslin, Garrett, Kapela, Kila, Olds, Sayama, Muraoka, Souza; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
01/24/2025
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by EDN on Tuesday, 01-28-25 2:00PM in House conference room 309 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
01/21/2025
|
Referred to EDN, HSG, FIN, referral sheet 1
|
|
|
House
|
01/17/2025
|
Introduced and Pass First Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
01/16/2025
|
Pending introduction.
|
|
|