Senate
|
03/06/2025
|
Referred to HHS/PSM, JDC.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2025
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2025
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 180).
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2025
|
Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with Representative(s) Alcos, Garcia, Matsumoto voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Pierick, Ward excused (2). Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2025
|
Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-04-25.
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2025
|
Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1056) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
02/26/2025
|
The committee on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Tarnas, Poepoe, Belatti, Hashem, Perruso, Takayama, Todd, Shimizu; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Garcia; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Cochran, Kahaloa.
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2025
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Wednesday, 02-26-25 2:00PM in House conference room 325 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
02/11/2025
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with Representative(s) Garcia, Pierick voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cochran, Ward excused (2).
|
|
|
House
|
02/11/2025
|
Reported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 322) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JHA.
|
|
|
House
|
02/05/2025
|
The committee on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Takayama, Keohokapu-Lee Loy, Amato, Chun, Marten, Olds, Takenouchi; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Alcos; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Garcia.
|
|
|
House
|
01/31/2025
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Wednesday, 02-05-25 9:30AM in House conference room 329 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
01/21/2025
|
Referred to HLT, JHA, referral sheet 1
|
|
|
House
|
01/16/2025
|
Introduced and Pass First Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
01/10/2025
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|