House | 02/13/2025 | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cochran, Kitagawa, Ward excused (3). | ||
House | 02/13/2025 | Reported from HSG (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 583) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. | ||
House | 02/12/2025 | The committee on HSG recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Evslin, Miyake, Grandinetti, Kila, Kitagawa, La Chica, Muraoka, Pierick; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Cochran. | ||
House | 02/06/2025 | Bill scheduled to be heard by HSG on Wednesday, 02-12-25 9:00AM in House conference room 430 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. | ||
House | 01/21/2025 | Referred to HSG, FIN, referral sheet 2 | ||
House | 01/21/2025 | Introduced and Pass First Reading. | ||
House | 01/17/2025 | Pending introduction. |