Senate
|
05/02/2025
|
Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 821).
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2025
|
Transmitted to Governor.
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2025
|
Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 888).
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2025
|
Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cochran excused (1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2025
|
Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2025
|
48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 04-30-25
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2025
|
Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 43).
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2025
|
Forty-eight (48) hours notice Wednesday, 04-30-25.
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2025
|
Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 43) as amended in (CD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2025
|
The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keohokalole, Rhoads, Fukunaga, McKelvey; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Awa.
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2025
|
The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Matayoshi, Todd, Iwamoto, Pierick; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2025
|
Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday 04-24-25 1:30PM in conference room 224.
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2025
|
Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Wednesday 04-23-25 1:30PM in conference room 224.
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2025
|
Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Tuesday 04-22-25 1:30PM in conference room 224.
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2025
|
Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Monday, 04-21-25 1:30PM in conference room 224.
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2025
|
Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 810).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2025
|
Senate Conferees Appointed: Keohokalole Chair; Rhoads Co-Chair; Fukunaga, McKelvey, Awa.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2025
|
Filed.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2025
|
Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 559).
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2025
|
House disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2025
|
Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 538) in amended form (SD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2025
|
Report Adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2025
|
One Day Notice 04-03-25.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2025
|
Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1509) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2025
|
The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDC were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Chang, San Buenaventura; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard, Awa.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2025
|
The committee(s) on JDC will hold a public decision making on 03-25-25 10:01AM; Conference Room 016 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2025
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2025
|
Reported from CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1254) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2025
|
The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keohokalole, Fukunaga, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) McKelvey, Richards.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2025
|
The committee(s) on CPN has scheduled a public hearing on 03-14-25 9:30AM; Conference Room 229 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2025
|
Referred to CPN, JDC.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2025
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2025
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 183).
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2025
|
Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Pierick, Ward excused (2). Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2025
|
Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1060), recommending passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
02/25/2025
|
The committee on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Tarnas, Poepoe, Belatti, Hashem, Perruso, Takayama, Todd; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Cochran, Kahaloa, Garcia, Shimizu.
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2025
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Tuesday, 02-25-25 2:00PM in House conference room 325 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2025
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cochran, Kong, Ward excused (3).
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2025
|
Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 253) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JHA.
|
|
|
House
|
01/30/2025
|
The committee on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Matayoshi, Chun, Ilagan, Ichiyama, Iwamoto, Kong, Lowen, Marten, Tam; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Pierick.
|
|
|
House
|
01/28/2025
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Thursday, 01-30-25 2:00PM in House conference room 329 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
01/21/2025
|
Referred to CPC, JHA, referral sheet 1
|
|
|
House
|
01/16/2025
|
Introduced and Pass First Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
01/13/2025
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|