House
|
05/01/2025
|
Transmitted to Governor.
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2025
|
Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 888).
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2025
|
Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cochran excused (1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2025
|
Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2025
|
48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 04-30-25
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2025
|
Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 34).
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2025
|
Forty-eight (48) hours notice Wednesday, 04-30-25.
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2025
|
Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 34) as amended in (CD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2025
|
The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Chang, Hashimoto, Moriwaki; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella.
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2025
|
The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Marten, Morikawa, Templo, Alcos; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Chun.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2025
|
Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-23-25 10:30AM; Conference Room 224.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2025
|
Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-21-25 10:30AM; Conference Room 224.
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2025
|
Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 810).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2025
|
Senate Conferees Appointed: Chang Chair; Hashimoto, Moriwaki Co-Chairs; Fevella.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2025
|
Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 732).
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2025
|
House Conferees Appointed: Marten, Morikawa Co-Chairs; Chun, Templo, Alcos.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2025
|
Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 621).
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2025
|
House disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2025
|
Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 577) in amended form (SD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2025
|
Report Adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2025
|
One Day Notice 04-04-25.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2025
|
Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1650) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2025
|
The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Moriwaki, Aquino, Elefante, Hashimoto, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Kim, Lee, C., Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) DeCoite, Fevella.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2025
|
The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-01-25 10:01AM; Conference Room 211 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2025
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2025
|
Reported from HOU/HHS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1186) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2025
|
The committee(s) on HHS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HHS were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) San Buenaventura, Aquino, Hashimoto, Keohokalole, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2025
|
The committee(s) on HOU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HOU were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Chang, Hashimoto, Aquino, Kanuha, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2025
|
The committee(s) on HOU/HHS has scheduled a public hearing on 03-12-25 1:05PM; Conference Room 225 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2025
|
Referred to HOU/HHS, WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2025
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2025
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 119).
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2025
|
Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cochran, Pierick, Templo, Ward excused (4). Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2025
|
Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 966), recommending passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
02/24/2025
|
The committee on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamashita, Takenouchi, Grandinetti, Holt, Hussey, Keohokapu-Lee Loy, Kitagawa, Kusch, Lamosao, Lee, M., Miyake, Morikawa, Templo, Alcos, Reyes Oda; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ward.
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2025
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Monday, 02-24-25 12:00PM in House conference room 308 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
02/12/2025
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cochran, Sayama, Ward excused (3).
|
|
|
House
|
02/12/2025
|
Reported from HSH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 519) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
|
|
|
House
|
02/11/2025
|
The committee on HSH recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Marten, Olds, Amato, Chun, Keohokapu-Lee Loy, Takayama, Takenouchi, Alcos, Garcia; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2025
|
Bill re-scheduled to be heard by HSH on Tuesday, 02-11-25 9:45AM in conference room 329 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
01/31/2025
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by HSH on Tuesday, 02-11-25 10:00AM in House conference room 329 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
01/21/2025
|
Referred to HSH, FIN, referral sheet 2
|
|
|
House
|
01/21/2025
|
Introduced and Pass First Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
01/17/2025
|
Pending introduction.
|
|
|