House
|
02/13/2025
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cochran, Kitagawa, Ward excused (3).
|
|
|
House
|
02/13/2025
|
Reported from WAL/EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 589) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
|
|
|
House
|
02/11/2025
|
The committee on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Lowen, Perruso, Kahaloa, Kusch; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Quinlan, Ward.
|
|
|
House
|
02/11/2025
|
The committee on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Hashem, Lamosao, Belatti, Ichiyama, Iwamoto, Morikawa, Poepoe, Shimizu, Souza; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Woodson.
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2025
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by WAL/EEP on Tuesday, 02-11-25 10:00AM in House conference room 411 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
01/21/2025
|
Referred to WAL/EEP, FIN, referral sheet 1
|
|
|
House
|
01/16/2025
|
Introduced and Pass First Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
01/13/2025
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|