Senate
|
03/06/2025
|
Referred to EDU/LBT, WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2025
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2025
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 294).
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2025
|
Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Pierick, Ward excused (2). Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2025
|
Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-04-25.
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2025
|
Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1011) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2025
|
The committee on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamashita, Takenouchi, Grandinetti, Holt, Hussey, Keohokapu-Lee Loy, Kitagawa, Kusch, Lamosao, Miyake, Templo, Reyes Oda; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Lee, M., Morikawa, Alcos, Ward.
|
|
|
House
|
02/19/2025
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Friday, 02-21-25 10:00AM in House conference room 308 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2025
|
Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cochran, Matayoshi, Poepoe, Ward excused (4).
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2025
|
Reported from EDN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 752), recommending referral to FIN.
|
|
|
House
|
02/13/2025
|
The committee on EDN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Woodson, La Chica, Amato, Evslin, Garrett, Kapela, Kila, Olds, Sayama, Souza; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Muraoka.
|
|
|
House
|
02/11/2025
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by EDN on Thursday, 02-13-25 2:00PM in House conference room 309 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
02/04/2025
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on EDN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cochran, Kong, Ward excused (3).
|
|
|
House
|
02/04/2025
|
Reported from LAB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 131) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to EDN.
|
|
|
House
|
01/30/2025
|
The committee on LAB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Sayama, Lee, M., Garrett, Kapela, Kong, Reyes Oda; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
01/27/2025
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by LAB on Thursday, 01-30-25 9:00AM in House conference room 309 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
01/23/2025
|
Referred to LAB, EDN, FIN, referral sheet 3
|
|
|
House
|
01/23/2025
|
Introduced and Pass First Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
01/21/2025
|
Pending introduction.
|
|
|