Senate
|
03/04/2025
|
Referred to EDU, WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2025
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2025
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 6).
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2025
|
Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cochran, Pierick, Templo, Ward excused (4). Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2025
|
Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 846), recommending passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2025
|
The committee on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamashita, Takenouchi, Grandinetti, Holt, Hussey, Keohokapu-Lee Loy, Kitagawa, Kusch, Lamosao, Lee, M., Miyake, Morikawa, Templo, Reyes Oda; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Alcos, Ward.
|
|
|
House
|
02/18/2025
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 02-20-25 10:00AM in House conference room 308 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
02/05/2025
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Shimizu voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Pierick voting no (1) and Representative(s) Cochran, Ward excused (2).
|
|
|
House
|
02/05/2025
|
Reported from EDN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 179) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
|
|
|
House
|
01/30/2025
|
The committee on EDN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Woodson, La Chica, Amato, Evslin, Garrett, Kila, Olds, Sayama, Muraoka, Souza; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Kapela.
|
|
|
House
|
01/28/2025
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by EDN on Thursday, 01-30-25 2:00PM in House conference room 309 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
01/21/2025
|
Referred to EDN, FIN, referral sheet 1
|
|
|
House
|
01/16/2025
|
Introduced and Pass First Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
01/13/2025
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|