Senate
|
03/06/2025
|
Referred to HOU/EDU, WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2025
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2025
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 185).
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2025
|
Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 3 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Pierick, Ward excused (2). Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2025
|
Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-04-25.
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2025
|
Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1035) as amended in HD 3, recommending passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
02/25/2025
|
The committee on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamashita, Takenouchi, Grandinetti, Holt, Hussey, Keohokapu-Lee Loy, Kusch, Lamosao, Lee, M., Miyake, Morikawa, Templo, Alcos, Reyes Oda; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Kitagawa, Ward.
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2025
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 02-25-25 10:00AM in House conference room 308 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2025
|
Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Pierick voting no (1) and Representative(s) Cochran, Matayoshi, Poepoe, Ward excused (4).
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2025
|
Reported from EDN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 754) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN.
|
|
|
House
|
02/13/2025
|
The committee on EDN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Woodson, La Chica, Amato, Evslin, Garrett, Kapela, Kila, Olds, Sayama, Souza; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Muraoka.
|
|
|
House
|
02/11/2025
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by EDN on Thursday, 02-13-25 2:00PM in House conference room 309 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2025
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on EDN with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Pierick voting no (1) and Representative(s) Ward excused (1).
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2025
|
Reported from HSG (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 217) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to EDN.
|
|
|
House
|
02/05/2025
|
The committee on HSG recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Evslin, Miyake, Grandinetti, Kila, Kitagawa, Muraoka; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Cochran, La Chica, Pierick.
|
|
|
House
|
01/31/2025
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by HSG on Wednesday, 02-05-25 9:00AM in House conference room 430 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
01/21/2025
|
Referred to HSG, EDN, FIN, referral sheet 1
|
|
|
House
|
01/16/2025
|
Introduced and Pass First Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
01/13/2025
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|