Senate
|
03/06/2025
|
Referred to PSM/CPN, JDC.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2025
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2025
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 300).
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2025
|
Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Alcos, Garcia, Kila, Kong, Matsumoto, Muraoka, Reyes Oda, Shimizu, Souza voting no (9) and Representative(s) Kapela, Pierick, Ward excused (3). Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2025
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with Representative(s) Matsumoto, Reyes Oda, Souza voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Alcos, Garcia, Kong, Muraoka, Shimizu voting no (5) and Representative(s) Cochran, Pierick, Templo, Ward excused (4).
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2025
|
Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 828) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2025
|
The committee on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Tarnas, Poepoe, Belatti, Cochran, Hashem, Kahaloa, Perruso, Takayama, Todd; Ayes with reservations: none; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Shimizu; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Garcia.
|
|
|
House
|
02/03/2025
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Thursday, 02-06-25 2:00PM in House conference room 325 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
01/23/2025
|
Referred to JHA, referral sheet 3
|
|
|
House
|
01/23/2025
|
Introduced and Pass First Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
01/21/2025
|
Pending introduction.
|
|
|