House | 02/13/2025 | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cochran, Kitagawa, Ward excused (3). | ||
House | 02/13/2025 | Reported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 572) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. | ||
House | 02/12/2025 | The committee on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Takayama, Keohokapu-Lee Loy, Amato, Chun, Olds; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Marten, Takenouchi, Alcos, Garcia. | ||
House | 02/10/2025 | Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Wednesday, 02-12-25 11:30AM in House conference room 329 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. | ||
House | 01/23/2025 | Referred to HLT, FIN, referral sheet 3 | ||
House | 01/23/2025 | Introduced and Pass First Reading. | ||
House | 01/21/2025 | Pending introduction. |