House
|
02/11/2025
|
The committee(s) on TOU/ECD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2025
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by TOU/ECD on Tuesday, 02-11-25 10:30AM in House conference room 423 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
02/04/2025
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on TOU/ECD with Representative(s) Garcia voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cochran, Kong, Ward excused (3).
|
|
|
House
|
02/04/2025
|
Reported from HSG (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 139) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to TOU/ECD.
|
|
|
House
|
01/29/2025
|
The committee on HSG recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Evslin, Miyake, Grandinetti, Kila, Kitagawa, La Chica, Pierick; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Muraoka; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Cochran.
|
|
|
House
|
01/27/2025
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by HSG on Wednesday, 01-29-25 9:15AM in House conference room 430 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
01/23/2025
|
Referred to HSG, TOU/ECD, FIN, referral sheet 3
|
|
|
House
|
01/23/2025
|
Introduced and Pass First Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
01/21/2025
|
Pending introduction.
|
|
|