House
|
04/30/2025
|
Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with Representative(s) Souza voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Garcia, Pierick voting no (2) and Representative(s) Cochran excused (1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2025
|
Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Awa). Excused, 0 (none).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2025
|
48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 04-30-25
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2025
|
Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 32).
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2025
|
Forty-eight (48) hours notice Wednesday, 04-30-25.
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2025
|
Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 32) as amended in (CD 1).
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2025
|
The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 3 Ayes: Representative(s) Kapela, Poepoe, Reyes Oda; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2025
|
The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Lee, C., Elefante, DeCorte; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2025
|
Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-24-25 11:00AM; Conference Room 329.
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2025
|
Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 865).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2025
|
Senate Conferees Appointed: Lee, C. Chair; Elefante, DeCorte.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2025
|
Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 732).
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2025
|
House Conferees Appointed: Kapela, Poepoe Co-Chairs; Reyes Oda.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2025
|
Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 704).
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2025
|
House disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2025
|
Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 693) in amended form (SD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2025
|
Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Awa). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2025
|
48 Hrs. Notice 04-08-25.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2025
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2025
|
Reported from TCA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1732) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2025
|
The committee(s) on TCA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TCA were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Lee, C., Inouye, Elefante, Kanuha, DeCorte; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2025
|
The committee(s) on TCA has scheduled a public hearing on 03-13-25 3:15PM; Conference Room 224 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2025
|
Referred to TCA.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2025
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2025
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 306).
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2025
|
Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Garcia voting no (1) and Representative(s) Pierick, Ward excused (2). Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2025
|
Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1078), recommending passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2025
|
The committee on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Tarnas, Poepoe, Belatti, Hashem, Kahaloa, Perruso, Takayama, Shimizu; Ayes with reservations: none; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Garcia; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Cochran, Todd.
|
|
|
House
|
02/19/2025
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Friday, 02-21-25 2:00PM in House conference room 325 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
02/11/2025
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Garcia voting no (1) and Representative(s) Cochran, Ward excused (2).
|
|
|
House
|
02/11/2025
|
Reported from CAA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 366) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JHA.
|
|
|
House
|
02/05/2025
|
The committee on CAA recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Kapela, Kong, Garrett, Lee, M., Sayama; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Reyes Oda.
|
|
|
House
|
01/30/2025
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by CAA on Wednesday, 02-05-25 10:30AM in House conference room 309 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
01/23/2025
|
Referred to CAA, JHA, referral sheet 3
|
|
|
House
|
01/23/2025
|
Introduced and Pass First Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
01/21/2025
|
Pending introduction.
|
|
|