Senate
|
04/03/2025
|
The committee on WAM deferred the measure.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2025
|
The committee(s) on WAM deferred the measure until 04-03-25 10:02AM; Conference Room 211 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2025
|
The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-28-25 10:02AM; Conference Room 211 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2025
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2025
|
Reported from EIG/CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1348) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2025
|
The committee(s) on EIG recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EIG were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Chang, DeCoite, Richards; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2025
|
The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keohokalole, Richards; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Fukunaga, McKelvey ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Awa; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2025
|
The committee(s) on EIG/CPN has scheduled a public hearing on 03-20-25 9:30AM; Conference Room 229 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2025
|
Referred to EIG/CPN, WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2025
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2025
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 45).
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2025
|
Passed Third Reading with Representative(s) Amato, Garcia voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cochran, Pierick, Templo, Ward excused (4). Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2025
|
Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 886), recommending passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2025
|
The committee on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamashita, Takenouchi, Grandinetti, Holt, Hussey, Keohokapu-Lee Loy, Kitagawa, Kusch, Lamosao, Lee, M., Miyake, Morikawa, Templo, Reyes Oda; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Alcos, Ward.
|
|
|
House
|
02/18/2025
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 02-20-25 12:00PM in House conference room 308 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2025
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Amato, Garcia voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cochran, Matayoshi, Poepoe, Ward excused (4).
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2025
|
Reported from EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 769) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
|
|
|
House
|
02/13/2025
|
The committee on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Lowen, Perruso, Kahaloa, Kusch; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Quinlan, Ward.
|
|
|
House
|
02/11/2025
|
Bill scheduled for decision making on Thursday, 02-13-25 10:15AM in conference room 325 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
02/11/2025
|
The committee(s) on EEP recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-13-25 10:15AM.
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2025
|
Bill scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 02-11-25 10:20AM in conference room 325 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2025
|
The committee(s) on EEP recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-11-25 10:20AM.
|
|
|
House
|
01/30/2025
|
Bill scheduled for decision making on Thursday, 02-06-25 9:01AM in conference room 325 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
01/30/2025
|
The committee(s) on EEP recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-06-25.
|
|
|
House
|
01/27/2025
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP on Thursday, 01-30-25 9:00AM in House conference room 325 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
01/23/2025
|
Referred to EEP, FIN, referral sheet 3
|
|
|
House
|
01/23/2025
|
Introduced and Pass First Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
01/21/2025
|
Pending introduction.
|
|
|