House
|
04/21/2025
|
Resolution adopted in final form.
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2025
|
Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 843).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2025
|
Report and Resolution Adopted. Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2025
|
One Day Notice 04-21-25.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2025
|
Reported from TCA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1933) with recommendation of adoption.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2025
|
The committee(s) on TCA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in TCA were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Lee, C., Inouye, Elefante, DeCorte; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Kanuha.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2025
|
The committee(s) on TCA has scheduled a public hearing on 04-10-25 3:00PM; Conference Room 224 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2025
|
Referred to TCA.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2025
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 392).
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2025
|
Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2025
|
Adopted as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Garrett, Keohokapu-Lee Loy, Ward excused (3).
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2025
|
Reported from CAA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1560) as amended in HD 1, recommending adoption.
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2025
|
The committee on CAA recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Kapela, Kong, Garrett, Lee, M., Sayama; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Reyes Oda.
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2025
|
Resolution scheduled to be heard by CAA on Wednesday, 03-19-25 9:30AM in conference room 309 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2025
|
Referred to CAA, referral sheet 22
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2025
|
Offered
|
|
|