Senate
|
04/30/2025
|
Received notice of Adoption in House (Hse. Com. No. 819).
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2025
|
Resolution adopted in final form.
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2025
|
Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cochran, Lamosao excused (2).
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2025
|
House agrees to Senate amendment(s).
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2025
|
One (1) day notice, Friday, 04-25-25.
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2025
|
Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 803) in amended form (SD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2025
|
Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2025
|
One Day Notice 04-16-25.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2025
|
Reported from HHS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1879) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2025
|
The committee(s) on HHS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HHS were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) San Buenaventura, Aquino, Hashimoto; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Keohokalole, Fevella.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2025
|
Re-Referred to HHS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2025
|
The committee(s) on HHS has scheduled a public hearing on 04-11-25 1:01PM; Conference Room 225 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2025
|
Referred to HHS, WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2025
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 542).
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2025
|
Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cochran, Woodson excused (2).
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2025
|
Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1826), recommending adoption.
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2025
|
The committee on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamashita, Takenouchi, Grandinetti, Holt, Hussey, Keohokapu-Lee Loy, Kitagawa, Kusch, Lamosao, Lee, M., Miyake, Morikawa, Templo, Alcos; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Reyes Oda, Ward.
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2025
|
Scheduled for decision making on Monday, 03-31-25 10:15AM in conference room 308 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2025
|
Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Garrett, Holt, Keohokapu-Lee Loy, Ward excused (4).
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2025
|
Reported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1527), recommending referral to FIN.
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2025
|
The committee on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Takayama, Keohokapu-Lee Loy, Amato, Chun, Marten, Olds, Takenouchi, Alcos, Garcia; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2025
|
Resolution scheduled to be heard by HLT on Friday, 03-21-25 9:30AM in conference room 329 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2025
|
Referred to HLT, FIN, referral sheet 22
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2025
|
Offered
|
|
|