Senate
|
04/04/2025
|
Referred to HHS, WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2025
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 548).
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2025
|
Adopted with Representative(s) Iwamoto voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Belatti voting no (1) and Representative(s) Cochran, Woodson excused (2).
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2025
|
Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1856), recommending adoption.
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2025
|
The committee on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Tarnas, Poepoe, Hashem, Kahaloa, Takayama, Todd, Garcia, Shimizu; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Perruso; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Belatti; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Cochran.
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2025
|
Resolution scheduled to be heard by JHA on Tuesday, 04-01-25 2:00PM in conference room 325 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2025
|
Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on JHA with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Garrett, Holt, Keohokapu-Lee Loy, Ward excused (4).
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2025
|
Reported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1528), recommending referral to JHA.
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2025
|
The committee on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Takayama, Keohokapu-Lee Loy, Amato, Chun, Marten, Olds, Takenouchi, Alcos, Garcia; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2025
|
Resolution scheduled to be heard by HLT on Friday, 03-21-25 9:30AM in conference room 329 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2025
|
Referred to HLT, JHA, referral sheet 22
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2025
|
Offered
|
|
|