House
|
04/21/2025
|
Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 844) in amended form (SD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2025
|
Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2025
|
One Day Notice 04-21-25.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2025
|
Reported from TCA/EIG (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1944) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2025
|
The committee(s) on EIG recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EIG were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Chang, DeCoite; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Richards, Fevella.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2025
|
The committee(s) on TCA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TCA were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Lee, C., Inouye, Elefante, Kanuha, DeCorte; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2025
|
The committee(s) on TCA/EIG has scheduled a public hearing on 04-17-25 1:00PM; Conference Room 225 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2025
|
Referred to TCA/EIG.
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2025
|
Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2025
|
Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cochran, Woodson excused (2).
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2025
|
Reported from PBS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1740), recommending adoption.
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2025
|
The committee on PBS recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Belatti, Iwamoto, Hashem, Ichiyama, Lamosao, Morikawa, Poepoe, Shimizu, Souza; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Woodson.
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2025
|
Resolution scheduled to be heard by PBS on Friday, 03-28-25 9:00AM in conference room 325 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2025
|
Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on PBS with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cochran, Garrett, Lowen, Ward excused (4).
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2025
|
Reported from TRN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1508), recommending referral to PBS.
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2025
|
The committee on TRN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Kila, Grandinetti, Evslin, Miyake, Muraoka, Pierick; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Cochran, Kitagawa, La Chica.
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2025
|
Resolution scheduled to be heard by TRN on Thursday, 03-20-25 10:15AM in conference room 430 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2025
|
Referred to TRN, PBS, referral sheet 22
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2025
|
Offered
|
|
|