House | 03/24/2025 | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Alcos, Reyes Oda voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Garcia, Muraoka, Pierick, Souza voting no (4) and Representative(s) Cochran, Garrett, Lowen, Ward excused (4). | ||
House | 03/24/2025 | Reported from TRN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1512), recommending referral to FIN. | ||
House | 03/20/2025 | The committee on TRN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Kila, Grandinetti, Evslin, Miyake; Ayes with reservations: none; 2 Noes: Representative(s) Muraoka, Pierick; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Cochran, Kitagawa, La Chica. | ||
House | 03/18/2025 | Resolution scheduled to be heard by TRN on Thursday, 03-20-25 10:15AM in conference room 430 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. | ||
House | 03/14/2025 | Referred to TRN, FIN, referral sheet 22 | ||
House | 03/06/2025 | Offered | ||
House | 03/04/2025 | To be offered. |