LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Hawaii HI
Legislatures
2025 Regular Session
House
Bills
HCR46
Action History
HI
Hawaii House Bill HCR46
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Hawaii 2025 Regular Session
Hawaii House Bill HCR46
Action History
House
03/20/2025
The committee(s) on EDN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
House
03/18/2025
Resolution scheduled to be heard by EDN on Thursday, 03-20-25 2:00PM in conference room 309 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
House
03/14/2025
Referred to EDN, referral sheet 22
House
03/06/2025
Offered
House
03/04/2025
To be offered.