House
|
04/21/2025
|
Resolution adopted in final form.
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2025
|
Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 836).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2025
|
Report and Resolution Adopted. Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2025
|
One Day Notice 04-21-25.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2025
|
Reported from GVO (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1937) with recommendation of adoption.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2025
|
The committee(s) on GVO recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in GVO were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) McKelvey, Gabbard, San Buenaventura; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Moriwaki, Fevella.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2025
|
Re-Referred to GVO.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2025
|
The committee(s) on GVO has scheduled a public hearing on 04-15-25 3:00PM; Conference Room 225 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2025
|
Referred to GVO, WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2025
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 513).
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2025
|
Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cochran, Woodson excused (2).
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2025
|
Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1796), recommending adoption.
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2025
|
The committee on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamashita, Takenouchi, Grandinetti, Holt, Hussey, Keohokapu-Lee Loy, Kitagawa, Kusch, Lamosao, Lee, M., Miyake, Morikawa, Templo, Alcos; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Reyes Oda, Ward.
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2025
|
Resolution scheduled to be heard by FIN on Monday, 03-31-25 10:00AM in conference room 308 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2025
|
Referred to FIN, referral sheet 22
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2025
|
Offered
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2025
|
To be offered.
|
|
|