Senate
|
04/14/2025
|
Report adopted, referred to JDC.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2025
|
Reported from EIG (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1875), with recommendation of referral to JDC.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2025
|
The committee(s) on EIG recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in EIG were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Chang, DeCoite, Richards; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2025
|
The committee(s) on EIG has scheduled a public hearing on 04-10-25 4:00PM; Conference Room 016 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2025
|
Referred to EIG, JDC.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2025
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 519).
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2025
|
Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Iwamoto, Souza voting no (2) and Representative(s) Cochran, Woodson excused (2).
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2025
|
Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1845), recommending adoption.
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2025
|
The committee on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Tarnas, Poepoe, Belatti, Hashem, Kahaloa, Perruso, Takayama, Todd, Garcia, Shimizu; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Cochran.
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2025
|
Resolution scheduled to be heard by JHA on Tuesday, 04-01-25 2:00PM in conference room 325 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2025
|
Referred to JHA, referral sheet 22
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2025
|
Offered
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2025
|
To be offered.
|
|
|