House
|
04/17/2025
|
Resolution adopted in final form.
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2025
|
Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 816).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2025
|
Report and Resolution Adopted. Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2025
|
One Day Notice 04-17-25.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2025
|
Reported from HOU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1920) with recommendation of adoption.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2025
|
The committee(s) on HOU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HOU were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Chang, Hashimoto, Aquino, Kanuha, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2025
|
The committee(s) on HOU added the measure to the public hearing scheduled on 04-10-25 1:00PM; CR 225 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2025
|
Referred to HOU.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2025
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 521).
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2025
|
Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cochran, Woodson excused (2).
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2025
|
Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1827), recommending adoption.
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2025
|
The committee on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamashita, Takenouchi, Grandinetti, Holt, Hussey, Keohokapu-Lee Loy, Kitagawa, Kusch, Lamosao, Lee, M., Miyake, Morikawa, Templo, Alcos; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Reyes Oda, Ward.
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2025
|
Scheduled for decision making on Monday, 03-31-25 10:15AM in conference room 308 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2025
|
Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Garrett, Holt, Keohokapu-Lee Loy, Ward excused (4).
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2025
|
Reported from HSG (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1523), recommending referral to FIN.
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2025
|
The committee on HSG recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Evslin, Miyake, Grandinetti, Muraoka, Pierick; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Cochran, Kila, Kitagawa, La Chica.
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2025
|
Resolution scheduled to be heard by HSG on Friday, 03-21-25 9:00AM in conference room 430 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2025
|
Referred to HSG, FIN, referral sheet 22
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2025
|
Offered
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2025
|
To be offered.
|
|
|