House
|
04/22/2025
|
Resolution adopted in final form.
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2025
|
Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 854).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2025
|
Report and Resolution Adopted. Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2025
|
One Day Notice 04-22-25.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2025
|
Reported from TCA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1963) with recommendation of adoption.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2025
|
The committee(s) on TCA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in TCA were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Lee, C., Elefante, Kanuha, DeCorte; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Inouye.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2025
|
The committee(s) on TCA has scheduled a public hearing on 04-16-25 3:00PM; Conference Room 225 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2025
|
Referred to TCA.
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2025
|
Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2025
|
Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cochran, Woodson excused (2).
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2025
|
Reported from PBS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1738), recommending adoption.
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2025
|
The committee on PBS recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Belatti, Iwamoto, Hashem, Ichiyama, Lamosao, Morikawa, Poepoe, Shimizu, Souza; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Woodson.
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2025
|
Resolution scheduled to be heard by PBS on Friday, 03-28-25 9:00AM in conference room 325 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2025
|
Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on PBS with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Garrett, Holt, Keohokapu-Lee Loy, Ward excused (4).
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2025
|
Reported from CAA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1546), recommending referral to PBS.
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2025
|
The committee on CAA recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Kapela, Kong, Garrett, Lee, M.; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Sayama, Reyes Oda.
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2025
|
Resolution scheduled to be heard by CAA on Wednesday, 03-19-25 9:30AM in conference room 309 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2025
|
Referred to CAA, PBS, referral sheet 22
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2025
|
Offered
|
|
|