House | 04/03/2025 | Resolution adopted in final form. | ||
House | 04/03/2025 | Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Garcia voting no (1) and Representative(s) Cochran, Woodson excused (2). | ||
House | 04/03/2025 | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1799), recommending adoption. | ||
House | 03/31/2025 | The committee on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamashita, Takenouchi, Grandinetti, Holt, Hussey, Keohokapu-Lee Loy, Kitagawa, Kusch, Lamosao, Lee, M., Miyake, Morikawa, Templo, Alcos; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Reyes Oda, Ward. | ||
House | 03/28/2025 | Resolution scheduled to be heard by FIN on Monday, 03-31-25 10:00AM in conference room 308 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. | ||
House | 03/14/2025 | Referred to FIN, referral sheet 22 | ||
House | 03/07/2025 | Offered |