House
|
04/03/2025
|
Resolution adopted in final form.
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2025
|
Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Garcia, Pierick voting no (2) and Representative(s) Cochran, Woodson excused (2).
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2025
|
Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1819), recommending adoption.
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2025
|
The committee on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamashita, Takenouchi, Grandinetti, Holt, Hussey, Keohokapu-Lee Loy, Kitagawa, Kusch, Lamosao, Lee, M., Miyake, Morikawa, Templo, Alcos; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Reyes Oda, Ward.
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2025
|
Scheduled for decision making on Monday, 03-31-25 10:15AM in conference room 308 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2025
|
Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Garcia, Pierick voting no (2) and Representative(s) Hashem, Hussey, Templo, Ward excused (4).
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2025
|
Reported from HSH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1605), recommending referral to FIN.
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2025
|
The committee on HSH recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Marten, Olds, Amato, Chun, Keohokapu-Lee Loy, Takayama, Alcos; Ayes with reservations: none; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Garcia; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Takenouchi.
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2025
|
Resolution scheduled to be heard by HSH on Thursday, 03-20-25 10:15AM in conference room 329 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2025
|
Referred to HSH, FIN, referral sheet 22
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2025
|
Offered
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2025
|
To be offered.
|
|
|