House | 04/03/2025 | Resolution adopted in final form. | ||
House | 04/03/2025 | Adopted as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cochran, Woodson excused (2). | ||
House | 04/03/2025 | Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1848) as amended in HD 1, recommending adoption. | ||
House | 04/01/2025 | The committee on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Tarnas, Poepoe, Belatti, Hashem, Kahaloa, Perruso, Takayama, Todd, Garcia, Shimizu; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Cochran. | ||
House | 03/28/2025 | Resolution scheduled to be heard by JHA on Tuesday, 04-01-25 2:00PM in conference room 325 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. | ||
House | 03/14/2025 | Referred to JHA, referral sheet 22 | ||
House | 03/06/2025 | Offered | ||
House | 03/05/2025 | To be offered. |