House
|
04/03/2025
|
Resolution adopted in final form.
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2025
|
Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Pierick voting no (1) and Representative(s) Cochran, Woodson excused (2).
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2025
|
Reported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1873), recommending adoption.
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2025
|
The committee on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Takayama, Keohokapu-Lee Loy, Amato, Chun, Marten, Olds, Takenouchi, Alcos, Garcia; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2025
|
Resolution scheduled to be heard by HLT on Wednesday, 04-02-25 10:30AM in conference room 329 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2025
|
Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on HLT with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Pierick voting no (1) and Representative(s) Hashem, Hussey, Templo, Ward excused (4).
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2025
|
Reported from HED (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1570), recommending referral to HLT.
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2025
|
The committee on HED recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Garrett, Amato, Evslin, Kila, La Chica, Olds, Woodson, Muraoka, Souza; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Kapela, Sayama.
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2025
|
Resolution scheduled to be heard by HED on Wednesday, 03-19-25 2:15PM in conference room 309 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2025
|
Referred to HED, HLT, referral sheet 22
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2025
|
Offered
|
|
|