Senate
|
04/25/2025
|
Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-25-25 5:20 PM; Conference Room 329.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2025
|
Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-25-25 3:15PM; Conference Room 329.
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2025
|
Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 848).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2025
|
Senate Conferees Appointed: San Buenaventura Chair; Lee, C. Co-Chairs; Hashimoto, Fevella.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2025
|
Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 754).
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2025
|
House Conferees Appointed: Takayama, Takenouchi Co-Chairs; Alcos.
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2025
|
Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 779).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2025
|
Senate disagrees with House amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2025
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 668).
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2025
|
Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Kila, Kitagawa, Lamosao, Matayoshi, Pierick voting no (5) and Representative(s) Cochran, Marten excused (2). Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2025
|
Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2011), recommending passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2025
|
The committee on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamashita, Takenouchi, Grandinetti, Holt, Hussey, Keohokapu-Lee Loy, Kitagawa, Kusch, Lamosao, Lee, M., Miyake, Morikawa, Templo, Alcos, Reyes Oda; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2025
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 04-02-25 3:30PM in House conference room 308 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2025
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Pierick voting no (1) and Representative(s) Cochran, Ward excused (2).
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2025
|
Reported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1312) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2025
|
The committee on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Takayama, Keohokapu-Lee Loy, Amato, Chun, Marten, Olds, Takenouchi, Alcos, Garcia; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2025
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Friday, 03-14-25 9:00AM in House conference room 329 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2025
|
Referred to HLT, FIN, referral sheet 18
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2025
|
Pass First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2025
|
Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 50) in amended form (SD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2025
|
Report Adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 22; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) McKelvey. Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Awa). Excused, 2 (Senator(s) Fukunaga, Kidani). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2025
|
One Day Notice 02-28-25.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2025
|
Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 782) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2025
|
The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 13 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Moriwaki, Aquino, DeCoite, Elefante, Hashimoto, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Kim, Lee, C., Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2025
|
The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-19-25 10:02AM; Conference Room 211 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2025
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2025
|
Reported from HHS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 625) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/12/2025
|
The committee(s) on HHS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HHS were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) San Buenaventura, Aquino, Hashimoto, Keohokalole, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2025
|
The committee(s) on HHS has scheduled a public hearing on 02-12-25 1:00PM; Conference Room 225 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/23/2025
|
Referred to HHS, WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/21/2025
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/17/2025
|
Introduced.
|
|
|