House
|
04/30/2025
|
Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cochran, Pierick excused (2).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2025
|
Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Awa). Excused, 0 (none).
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2025
|
Forty-eight (48) hours notice Wednesday, 04-30-25.
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2025
|
Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 92) as amended in (CD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2025
|
48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 04-30-25.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2025
|
Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 92).
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2025
|
The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 3 Ayes: Representative(s) Kila, Poepoe, Grandinetti; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Muraoka.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2025
|
The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Lee, C., Elefante, DeCorte; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Inouye.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2025
|
Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-24-25 10:35AM; Conference Room 329.
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2025
|
Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 863).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2025
|
Senate Conferees Appointed: Lee, C. Chair; Elefante, Inouye, DeCorte.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2025
|
Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 757).
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2025
|
House Conferees Appointed: Kila, Poepoe Co-Chairs; Grandinetti, Muraoka.
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2025
|
Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 481).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2025
|
Senate disagrees with House amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2025
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 442).
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2025
|
Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cochran excused (1). Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2025
|
Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1754), recommending passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2025
|
The committee on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Tarnas, Poepoe, Belatti, Hashem, Kahaloa, Perruso, Takayama, Todd, Garcia, Shimizu; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Cochran.
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2025
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Friday, 03-28-25 2:00PM in House conference room 325 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2025
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cochran, Ward excused (2).
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2025
|
Reported from TRN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1316) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JHA.
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2025
|
The committee on TRN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Kila, Grandinetti, Evslin, Kitagawa, Miyake, Muraoka; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Cochran, La Chica, Pierick.
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2025
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by TRN on Thursday, 03-13-25 9:00AM in House conference room 430 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2025
|
Referred to TRN, JHA, referral sheet 19
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2025
|
Pass First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2025
|
Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 257) in amended form (SD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2025
|
Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2025
|
48 Hrs. Notice 03-04-25.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2025
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2025
|
Reported from TCA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 809) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/18/2025
|
The committee(s) on TCA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TCA were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Lee, C., Inouye, Elefante, Kanuha, DeCorte; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2025
|
The committee(s) on TCA deferred the measure until 02-18-25 3:01PM; Conference Room 224.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/04/2025
|
The committee(s) on TCA deferred the measure until 02-06-25 3:01PM; Conference Room 224.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/30/2025
|
The committee(s) on TCA deferred the measure until 02-04-25 3:00PM; Conference Room 224.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/27/2025
|
The committee(s) on TCA has scheduled a public hearing on 01-30-25 3:00PM; Conference Room 224 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/23/2025
|
Referred to TCA.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/21/2025
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/17/2025
|
Introduced.
|
|
|