LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Hawaii HI
Legislatures
2025 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB1191
Action History
HI
Hawaii Senate Bill SB1191
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Hawaii 2025 Regular Session
Hawaii Senate Bill SB1191
Action History
Senate
02/06/2025
The committee(s) on AEN/HHS deleted the measure from the public hearing scheduled on 02-07-25 2:00PM; CR 225 & Videoconference.
Senate
02/04/2025
The committee(s) on AEN/HHS has scheduled a public hearing on 02-07-25 2:00PM; Conference Room 225 & Videoconference.
Senate
01/27/2025
Referred to AEN/HHS, WAM.
Senate
01/21/2025
Passed First Reading.
Senate
01/17/2025
Introduced.