Senate | 02/06/2025 | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDC/WAM. | ||
Senate | 02/06/2025 | Reported from WTL/PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 59) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to JDC/WAM. | ||
Senate | 02/03/2025 | The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in PSM were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Elefante, Wakai, DeCorte; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Fukunaga, Rhoads. | ||
Senate | 02/03/2025 | The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WTL were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Elefante, Chang, McKelvey, DeCorte; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. | ||
Senate | 01/31/2025 | The committee(s) on WTL/PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-03-25 1:05PM; Conference Room 229 & Videoconference. | ||
Senate | 01/17/2025 | Referred to WTL/PSM, JDC/WAM. | ||
Senate | 01/15/2025 | Introduced and passed First Reading. | ||
Senate | 01/10/2025 | Pending Introduction. |