Senate | 02/14/2025 | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDC. | ||
Senate | 02/14/2025 | Reported from PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 554) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to JDC. | ||
Senate | 02/12/2025 | The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in PSM were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Elefante, Wakai, Fukunaga, Rhoads; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) DeCorte; and 0 Excused: none. | ||
Senate | 02/07/2025 | The committee(s) on PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-12-25 3:00PM; Conference Room 225 & Videoconference. | ||
Senate | 01/27/2025 | Referred to PSM, JDC. | ||
Senate | 01/23/2025 | Introduced and passed First Reading. | ||
Senate | 01/21/2025 | Pending Introduction. |