Senate
|
05/02/2025
|
Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 821).
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2025
|
Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 888).
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2025
|
Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cochran, Pierick excused (2).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2025
|
Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2025
|
Forty-eight (48) hours notice Wednesday, 04-30-25.
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2025
|
Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 72) as amended in (CD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2025
|
48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 04-30-25.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2025
|
Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 72).
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2025
|
The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 3 Ayes: Representative(s) Ilagan, Poepoe, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2025
|
The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) DeCoite, Fukunaga, Chang; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Awa.
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2025
|
Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Thursday, 04-24-25 3:00PM in conference room 411.
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2025
|
Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 829).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2025
|
Senate Conferees Appointed: DeCoite Chair; Fukunaga, Chang Co-Chairs; Awa.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2025
|
Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 731).
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2025
|
House Conferees Appointed: Ilagan, Poepoe Co-Chairs; Matsumoto.
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2025
|
Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 779).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2025
|
Senate disagrees with House amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2025
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 681).
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2025
|
Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cochran, Marten excused (2). Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2025
|
Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-08-25.
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2025
|
Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2024) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2025
|
The committee on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Tarnas, Poepoe, Belatti, Hashem, Kahaloa, Perruso, Takayama, Todd, Garcia, Shimizu; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Cochran.
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2025
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Wednesday, 04-02-25 2:00PM in House conference room 325 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2025
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cochran, Ward excused (2).
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2025
|
Reported from ECD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1289) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JHA.
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2025
|
The committee on ECD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Ilagan, Hussey, Tam, Templo, Todd, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Holt.
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2025
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by ECD on Friday, 03-14-25 10:00AM in House conference room 423 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2025
|
Referred to ECD, JHA, referral sheet 19
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2025
|
Pass First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2025
|
Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 310) in amended form (SD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2025
|
Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2025
|
One Day Notice 03-04-25.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2025
|
Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1065) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2025
|
The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDC were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Chang, San Buenaventura, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/18/2025
|
The committee(s) on JDC will hold a public decision making on 02-20-25 10:01AM; CR 016 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/12/2025
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/12/2025
|
Reported from EDT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 396) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2025
|
The committee(s) on EDT recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EDT were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) DeCoite, Wakai, Fukunaga, Kim, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/03/2025
|
The committee(s) on EDT has scheduled a public hearing on 02-06-25 1:15PM; Conference Room 229 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/27/2025
|
Referred to EDT, JDC.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/23/2025
|
Introduced and passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/21/2025
|
Pending Introduction.
|
|
|