Senate
|
04/23/2025
|
Enrolled to Governor.
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2025
|
Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 871).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2025
|
Passed Final Reading. Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2025
|
Received notice of reconsideration and Senate agreement (Sen. Com. No. 857).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2025
|
One Day Notice 04-23-25
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2025
|
Senate agrees with House amendments. Placed on the calendar for Final Reading on 04-23-25.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2025
|
Reconsideration of action taken on 04-04-25 in disagreeing to the House amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2025
|
Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 590).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2025
|
Senate disagrees with House amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2025
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 488).
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2025
|
Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cochran, Woodson excused (2). Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2025
|
Forty-eight (48) hours notice Thursday, 04-03-25.
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2025
|
Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1744) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2025
|
The committee on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Matayoshi, Chun, Ilagan, Iwamoto, Kong, Lowen, Marten, Tam, Pierick; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ichiyama.
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2025
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Tuesday, 03-25-25 2:00PM in House conference room 329 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2025
|
Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cochran, Ward excused (2).
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2025
|
Reported from LAB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1387), recommending referral to CPC.
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2025
|
The committee on LAB recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Sayama, Lee, M., Garrett, Kapela, Kong, Reyes Oda; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2025
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by LAB on Tuesday, 03-18-25 9:30AM in House conference room 309 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2025
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on LAB with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cochran, Holt, Ward, Woodson excused (4).
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2025
|
Reported from TRN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1196) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to LAB.
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2025
|
The committee on TRN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Kila, Grandinetti, Evslin, Kitagawa, La Chica, Miyake, Muraoka, Pierick; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Cochran.
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2025
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by TRN on Tuesday, 03-11-25 9:00AM in House conference room 430 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2025
|
Referred to TRN, LAB, CPC, referral sheet 19
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2025
|
Pass First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2025
|
Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 322) in amended form (SD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2025
|
Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2025
|
One Day Notice 03-04-25.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2025
|
Reported from JDC/WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 932) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2025
|
The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 13 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Moriwaki, Aquino, DeCoite, Elefante, Hashimoto, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Kim, Lee, C., Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2025
|
The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDC were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Gabbard, Chang, San Buenaventura, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2025
|
The committee(s) on JDC/WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-27-25 10:25AM; Conference Room 211 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/11/2025
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC/WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/11/2025
|
Reported from TCA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 247) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC/WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2025
|
The committee(s) on TCA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TCA were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Lee, C., Elefante, Kanuha, DeCorte; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Inouye.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/03/2025
|
The committee(s) on TCA has scheduled a public hearing on 02-06-25 3:00PM; Conference Room 224 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/27/2025
|
Referred to TCA, JDC/WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/23/2025
|
Introduced and passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/21/2025
|
Pending Introduction.
|
|
|