Senate
|
05/02/2025
|
Enrolled to Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2025
|
Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 821).
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2025
|
Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 888).
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2025
|
Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with Representative(s) Iwamoto voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Garcia, Muraoka, Pierick, Shimizu voting no (4) and Representative(s) Cochran excused (1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2025
|
Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 2 (Senator(s) Awa, DeCorte). Excused, 0 (none).
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2025
|
Forty-eight (48) hours notice Wednesday, 04-30-25.
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2025
|
Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 201) as amended in (CD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2025
|
48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 04-30-25.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2025
|
Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 201).
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2025
|
The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Lowen, Yamashita, Kusch, Perruso; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Alcos.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2025
|
The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Hashimoto, Keohokalole, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2025
|
Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-25-25 5:50 PM; Conference Room 309.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2025
|
Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-25-25 5:15 PM; Conference Room 309.
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2025
|
Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-25-25 9:15AM in conference room 325.
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2025
|
Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Thursday, 04-24-25 9:15AM in conference room 325.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2025
|
Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 754).
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2025
|
Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 825).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2025
|
Senate Conferees Appointed: Hashimoto Chair; Keohokalole Co-Chair; Fevella.
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2025
|
House Conferees Appointed: Lowen, Yamashita Co-Chairs; Kusch, Perruso, Alcos.
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2025
|
Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 590).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2025
|
Senate disagrees with House amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2025
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 496).
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2025
|
Passed Third Reading with Representative(s) Iwamoto voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Garcia, Muraoka, Pierick voting no (3) and Representative(s) Cochran, Woodson excused (2). Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2025
|
Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1936), recommending passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2025
|
The committee on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamashita, Takenouchi, Grandinetti, Hussey, Keohokapu-Lee Loy, Kitagawa, Kusch, Lamosao, Lee, M., Miyake, Morikawa, Templo, Alcos, Reyes Oda; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Holt, Ward.
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2025
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Monday, 03-31-25 3:15PM in House conference room 308 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2025
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Reyes Oda voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Garcia, Muraoka, Pierick voting no (3) and Representative(s) Cochran, Garrett, Kapela, Kitagawa, Ward excused (5).
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2025
|
Reported from EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1492) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2025
|
The committee on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Lowen, Perruso, Kahaloa, Kusch, Quinlan; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ward.
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2025
|
Bill scheduled for decision making on Thursday, 03-20-25 11:30AM in conference room 325 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2025
|
The committee(s) on EEP recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 03-20-25 11:30AM.
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2025
|
Bill scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 03-18-25 9:20AM in conference room 325 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2025
|
The committee(s) on EEP recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 03-18-25.
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2025
|
Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 03-12-25 11:15AM in conference room 325 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2025
|
The committee(s) on EEP recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 03-12-25 11:15AM.
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2025
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP on Tuesday, 03-11-25 9:00AM in House conference room 325 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2025
|
Referred to EEP, FIN, referral sheet 19
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2025
|
Pass First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2025
|
Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 356) in amended form (SD 2).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2025
|
Report Adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 2 (Senator(s) Awa, DeCorte). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2025
|
48 Hrs. Notice 03-04-25.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2025
|
Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1050) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2025
|
The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 13 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Moriwaki, Aquino, DeCoite, Elefante, Hashimoto, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Kim, Lee, C., Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2025
|
The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-27-25 10:30AM; Conference Room 211 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2025
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2025
|
Reported from EIG/CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 674) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/11/2025
|
The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keohokalole, Fukunaga, Richards; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Awa; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) McKelvey.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/11/2025
|
The committee(s) on EIG recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EIG were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Chang, DeCoite, Richards, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2025
|
The committee(s) on EIG/CPN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-11-25 9:30AM; Conference Room 229 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/27/2025
|
Referred to EIG/CPN, WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/23/2025
|
Introduced and passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/22/2025
|
Pending Introduction.
|
|
|