Hawaii 2025 Regular Session

Hawaii Senate Bill SB1526 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 22, 2025

Amended

Bill April 26, 2025
Bill March 18, 2025
Bill February 28, 2025
Bill February 10, 2025