House
|
03/14/2025
|
The committee(s) on HED recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2025
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by HED on Friday, 03-14-25 2:00PM in House conference room 309 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2025
|
Referred to HED, FIN, referral sheet 18
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2025
|
Pass First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2025
|
Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 58).
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2025
|
Report Adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Elefante, Ihara, Keohokalole, McKelvey, Richards. Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 2 (Senator(s) Fukunaga, Kidani). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2025
|
One Day Notice 02-28-25.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2025
|
Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 787) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/18/2025
|
The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 12 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Moriwaki, Aquino, Elefante, Hashimoto, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Kim, Lee, C., Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) DeCoite.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2025
|
The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-18-25 10:01AM; Conference Room 211 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2025
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2025
|
Reported from HRE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 453) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/11/2025
|
The committee(s) on HRE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HRE were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kim, Kidani, Fukunaga, Hashimoto; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2025
|
The committee(s) on HRE has scheduled a public hearing on 02-11-25 3:10PM; Conference Room 229 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/27/2025
|
Referred to HRE, WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/23/2025
|
Introduced and passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/22/2025
|
Pending Introduction.
|
|
|