House
|
04/25/2025
|
Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday, 04-25-25 2:40 PM; Conference Room 411.
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2025
|
Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday, 04-25-25 at 10:50AM in Conference Room 325.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2025
|
Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-25-25 9:40AM; Conference Room 325.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2025
|
Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-24-25 9:30AM; Conference Room 325.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2025
|
Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-23-25 9:31AM; Conference Room 325.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2025
|
Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 754).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2025
|
Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-22-25 9:30AM; Conference Room 325.
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2025
|
House Conferees Appointed: Kahaloa, Morikawa Co-Chairs; Kusch, Quinlan, Matsumoto.
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2025
|
Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 789).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2025
|
Senate Conferees Appointed: Gabbard Chair; DeCoite Co-Chair; Richards, Awa.
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2025
|
Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 590).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2025
|
Senate disagrees with House amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2025
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 498).
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2025
|
Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cochran, Woodson excused (2). Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2025
|
Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1898), recommending passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2025
|
The committee on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamashita, Takenouchi, Grandinetti, Holt, Keohokapu-Lee Loy, Kitagawa, Kusch, Lamosao, Lee, M., Miyake, Morikawa, Templo, Alcos, Reyes Oda; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Hussey, Ward.
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2025
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Friday, 03-28-25 3:30PM in House conference room 308 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2025
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cochran, Lowen, Reyes Oda, Ward excused (4).
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2025
|
Reported from AGR (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1282) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2025
|
The committee on AGR recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Kahaloa, Kusch, Lowen, Perruso; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Quinlan, Ward.
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2025
|
Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 03-12-25 10:00AM in conference room 325 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2025
|
The committee(s) on AGR recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 03-12-25.
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2025
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by AGR on Friday, 03-07-25 10:30AM in House conference room 325 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2025
|
Referred to AGR, FIN, referral sheet 18
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2025
|
Pass First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2025
|
Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 59) in amended form (SD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2025
|
Report Adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 2 (Senator(s) Fukunaga, Kidani). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2025
|
One Day Notice 02-28-25.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2025
|
Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 788) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/18/2025
|
The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 12 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Moriwaki, Aquino, Elefante, Hashimoto, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Kim, Lee, C., Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) DeCoite.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2025
|
The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-18-25 10:01AM; Conference Room 211 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2025
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2025
|
Reported from AEN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 460) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/10/2025
|
The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in AEN were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Richards, DeCoite, Rhoads, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2025
|
The committee(s) on AEN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-10-25 1:01PM; Conference Room 224 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/27/2025
|
Referred to AEN, WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/23/2025
|
Introduced and passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/22/2025
|
Pending Introduction.
|
|
|