Senate
|
05/02/2025
|
Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 821).
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2025
|
Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 888).
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2025
|
Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Garrett voting no (1) and Representative(s) Cochran, Pierick excused (2).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2025
|
Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2025
|
Forty-eight (48) hours notice Wednesday, 04-30-25.
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2025
|
Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 147) as amended in (CD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2025
|
48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 04-30-25.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2025
|
Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 147).
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2025
|
The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 3 Ayes: Representative(s) Sayama, Lee, M., Reyes Oda; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2025
|
The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Aquino, Moriwaki, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2025
|
Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-25-25 10:15AM; Conference Room 016.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2025
|
Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-24-25 10:15AM; Conference Room 016.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2025
|
Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-23-25 10:15AM; Conference Room 016.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2025
|
Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-22-25 10:15AM; Conference Room 016.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2025
|
Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 754).
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2025
|
House Conferees Appointed: Sayama, Lee, M. Co-Chairs; Reyes Oda.
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2025
|
Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 809).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2025
|
Senate Conferees Appointed: Aquino Chair; Moriwaki Co-Chair; Fevella.
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2025
|
Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 590).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2025
|
Senate disagrees with House amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2025
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 499).
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2025
|
Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Pierick voting no (1) and Representative(s) Cochran, Woodson excused (2). Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2025
|
Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1920), recommending passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2025
|
The committee on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamashita, Takenouchi, Grandinetti, Holt, Keohokapu-Lee Loy, Kitagawa, Kusch, Lamosao, Lee, M., Miyake, Morikawa, Templo, Alcos, Reyes Oda; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Hussey, Ward.
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2025
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Friday, 03-28-25 2:00PM in House conference room 308 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2025
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Pierick voting no (1) and Representative(s) Cochran, Ward excused (2).
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2025
|
Reported from LAB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1322) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2025
|
The committee on LAB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Sayama, Lee, M., Garrett, Kapela, Kong, Reyes Oda; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2025
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by LAB on Thursday, 03-13-25 9:00AM in House conference room 309 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2025
|
Referred to LAB, FIN, referral sheet 17
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2025
|
Pass First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/19/2025
|
Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 16) in amended form (SD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2025
|
Report Adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 22; Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 3 (Senator(s) Gabbard, Kouchi, Richards). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/18/2025
|
One Day Notice 02-19-25.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/18/2025
|
Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 680) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/12/2025
|
The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 13 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Moriwaki, Aquino, DeCoite, Elefante, Hashimoto, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Kim, Lee, C., Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/10/2025
|
The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-12-25 10:01AM; Conference Room 211 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2025
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2025
|
Reported from LBT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 54) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/31/2025
|
The committee(s) on LBT recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in LBT were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Aquino, Lee, C., Ihara, Moriwaki; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/28/2025
|
The committee(s) on LBT has scheduled a public hearing on 01-31-25 3:00PM; Conference Room 224 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/27/2025
|
Referred to LBT, WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/23/2025
|
Introduced and passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/22/2025
|
Pending Introduction.
|
|
|